OH SB26 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on October 10 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - Concurred in House amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 5739.01, 5739.012, 5739.02, 5739.03, 5747.01, and 5747.08 and to repeal section 101.61 of the Revised Code and to amend Sections 333.83 and 757.150 of H.B. 166 of the 133rd General Assembly to authorize a state income tax deduction for teachers' out-of-pocket expenses for professional development and classroom supplies, to modify the business income deduction and delay some tax credit repeals, to exempt feminine hygiene products and some incontinence products from sales and use tax, to abolish the Public Office Compensation Advisory Commission, and to modify a "Food Farmacy" pilot project earmark.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permit income tax deduction for certain teacher expenses

Sponsors

Rep. Niraj Antani [R]Rep. Brian Baldridge [R]Rep. Gil Blair [D]Rep. Kristin Boggs [D]
Rep. Juanita Brent [D]Rep. Richard Brown [D]Rep. James Butler [R]Rep. Jamie Callender [R]
Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]Rep. Sara Carruthers [R]Rep. Jack Cera [D]Rep. Randi Clites [D]
Rep. Erica Crawley [D]Rep. Jon Cross [R]Rep. Jeffrey Crossman [D]Rep. Sedrick Denson [D]
Rep. Jay Edwards [R]Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]Rep. Haraz Ghanbari [R]Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]
Rep. Dave Greenspan [R]Rep. Stephen Hambley [R]Rep. Paula Hicks-Hudson [D]Rep. Brett Hudson Hillyer [R]
Rep. Ron Hood [R]Rep. James Hoops [R]Rep. Stephanie Howse [D]Rep. Catherine Ingram [D]
Sen. Kris Jordan [R]Rep. Candice Keller [R]Rep. Brigid Kelly [D]Rep. Kyle Koehler [R]
Rep. Laura Lanese [R]Rep. George Lang [R]Rep. Michele Lepore-hagan [D]Rep. Mary Lightbody [D]
Rep. Beth Liston [D]Rep. Don Manning [R]Rep. Gayle Manning [R]Rep. Adam Miller [D]
Rep. Joe Miller [D]Rep. Jessica Miranda [D]Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]Sen. Scott Oelslager [R]
Rep. John Patterson [D]Rep. Thomas Patton [R]Rep. Rick Perales [R]Rep. Phil Plummer [R]
Rep. Bill Reineke [R]Rep. Tracy Richardson [R]Rep. Craig Riedel [R]Rep. Phil Robinson [D]
Rep. Bill Roemer [R]Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. Allison Russo [D]Rep. Scott Ryan [R]
Rep. William Seitz [R]Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]Rep. Todd Smith [R]Rep. Lisa Sobecki [D]
Rep. Dick Stein [R]Rep. D. J. Swearingen [R]Rep. Bride Sweeney [D]Rep. Emilia Strong Sykes [D]
Rep. Terrence Upchurch [D]Rep. Casey Weinstein [D]Rep. Thomas West [D]Rep. Scott Wiggam [R]
Rep. Shane Wilkin [R]Sen. Joseph Uecker [R]

Roll Calls

2019-10-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-10 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-01 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-01 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-23SenateConcurred in House amendments
2019-10-10HousePassed
2019-10-10HouseReported - Substitute: Finance
2019-10-01HouseRe-referred: Finance
2019-10-01HouseRe-referred: Rules and Reference
2019-05-14HouseRefer to Committee: Ways and Means
2019-05-13HouseIntroduced
2019-05-08SenatePassed
2019-05-08SenateReported: Ways and Means
2019-02-20SenateRefer to Committee: Ways and Means
2019-02-12SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Repealed CodeCitation Text
101Repealed CodeCitation Text
10161Repealed CodeCitation Text
57Amended CodeCitation Text
5739Amended CodeCitation Text
573901Amended CodeCitation Text
5739012Amended CodeCitation Text
573902Amended CodeCitation Text
573903Amended CodeCitation Text
5747Amended CodeCitation Text
574701Amended CodeCitation Text
574708Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA133-SB-26
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/sb26/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/sb26/RS/01?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/sb26/PS/02?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/sb26/RFH/03?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/sb26/RH/04?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/sb26/RCH/05?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/sb26/RH/06?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/sb26/PH/07?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/sb26/EN/08?format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA133-SB-26

Bill Comments

feedback