OH SB7 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 53-31)
Status: Passed on April 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-28 - Effective 4/28/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 4743.04 and 5903.04 and to enact section 4743.041 of the Revised Code to require state occupational licensing agencies, under certain circumstances, to issue temporary licenses or certificates to members of the military and spouses who are licensed in another jurisdiction and have moved to Ohio for military duty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regards temporary occupational licensing for military

Sponsors

Rep. Niraj Antani [R]Rep. Brian Baldridge [R]Rep. Gil Blair [D]Rep. Kristin Boggs [D]
Rep. Juanita Brent [D]Rep. Richard Brown [D]Rep. James Butler [R]Rep. Jamie Callender [R]
Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]Rep. Sara Carruthers [R]Rep. Jack Cera [D]Rep. Randi Clites [D]
Rep. Erica Crawley [D]Rep. Jon Cross [R]Rep. Jeffrey Crossman [D]Rep. Robert Cupp [R]
Rep. Anthony DeVitis [R]Rep. Bill Dean [R]Rep. Sedrick Denson [D]Rep. Jay Edwards [R]
Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]Rep. Haraz Ghanbari [R]Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]Rep. Doug Green [R]
Rep. Dave Greenspan [R]Rep. Stephen Hambley [R]Rep. Paula Hicks-Hudson [D]Rep. Brett Hudson Hillyer [R]
Rep. Adam Holmes [R]Rep. Ron Hood [R]Rep. James Hoops [R]Rep. Stephanie Howse [D]
Rep. Catherine Ingram [D]Rep. Don Jones [R]Sen. Kris Jordan [R]Rep. Darrell Kick [R]
Rep. Kyle Koehler [R]Rep. Jeff LaRe [R]Rep. Laura Lanese [R]Rep. George Lang [R]
Rep. David Leland [D]Rep. Michele Lepore-hagan [D]Rep. Mary Lightbody [D]Rep. Scott Lipps [R]
Rep. Beth Liston [D]Rep. Don Manning [R]Rep. Gayle Manning [R]Rep. Riordan McClain [R]
Rep. Derek Merrin [R]Rep. Adam Miller [D]Rep. Joe Miller [D]Rep. Jessica Miranda [D]
Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]Sen. Scott Oelslager [R]Rep. John Patterson [D]Rep. Thomas Patton [R]
Rep. Rick Perales [R]Rep. Phil Plummer [R]Rep. Jena Powell [R]Rep. Bill Reineke [R]
Rep. Tracy Richardson [R]Rep. Craig Riedel [R]Rep. Bill Roemer [R]Rep. John Rogers [D]
Rep. Mark Romanchuk [R]Rep. Allison Russo [D]Rep. Scott Ryan [R]Rep. Gary Scherer [R]
Rep. William Seitz [R]Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]Rep. Kent Smith [D]Rep. Todd Smith [R]
Rep. Lisa Sobecki [D]Rep. Dick Stein [R]Rep. Jason Stephens [R]Rep. Reggie Stoltzfus [R]
Rep. D. J. Swearingen [R]Rep. Bride Sweeney [D]Rep. Emilia Strong Sykes [D]Rep. Terrence Upchurch [D]
Rep. Thomas West [D]Rep. Scott Wiggam [R]Sen. Brian Hill [R]Sen. Joseph Uecker [R]

Roll Calls

2019-11-06 - Senate - Senate Failed (Y: 0 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-10-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-17 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-28 Effective 4/28/20
2019-12-12HouseConference report agreed to
2019-12-11SenateConference report agreed to: Conference Committee on SB 7
2019-11-13HouseInsist on amendments; asks for committee of conference
2019-11-13SenateConference managers: Sens. - Huffman, M., Hackett, Antonio: Conference Committee on SB 7
2019-11-06SenateRefused to concur in House amendments
2019-10-24HousePassed
2019-10-17HouseReported - Substitute: Armed Services and Veterans Affairs
2019-04-02HouseRefer to Committee: Armed Services and Veterans Affairs
2019-03-29HouseIntroduced
2019-03-27SenatePassed
2019-03-27SenateReported - Substitute: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce
2019-02-20SenateRefer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce
2019-02-12SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
47Amended CodeCitation Text
4743Amended CodeCitation Text
474304Amended CodeCitation Text
4743041New CodeSee Bill Text
59Amended CodeCitation Text
5903Amended CodeCitation Text
590304Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA133-SB-7
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/sb7/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/sb7/RS/01?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/sb7/PS/02?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/sb7/RH/03?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/sb7/PH/04?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/sb7/CR/05?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/sb7/EN/06?format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA133-SB-7

Bill Comments

feedback