OK HB1020 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/23/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/23/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Professions and occupations; permitting individuals to access physical therapy without certain referral; effective date.
Title
Professions and occupations; permitting individuals to access physical therapy without certain referral; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Kim David [R] | Rep. Arthur Hulbert [R] | Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] | Rep. Dan Kirby [R] |
Rep. Sean Roberts [R] | Rep. Bobby Cleveland [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 68 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 68 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | House | Approved by Governor 05/23/2014 |
2014-05-22 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-05-22 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-05-22 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 35 Nays: 7 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2014-05-19 | Senate | CCR read |
2014-05-19 | House | To Senate |
2014-05-19 | House | Ayes: 44 Nays: 16 |
2014-05-19 | House | Motion to reconsider tabled |
2014-05-19 | House | Measure passed: Ayes: 56 Nays: 28 |
2014-05-19 | House | CCR adopted |
2014-05-12 | House | Title restored |
2014-05-12 | House | CCR submitted |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named David, Crain, Stanislawski, Holt, Shumate, Ballenger |
2014-04-29 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Public Health |
2014-04-15 | House | SA's received |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2014-03-11 | Senate | coauthored by Kirby |
2014-02-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-24 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-02-20 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-02-20 | House | Motion to reconsider tabled |
2014-02-19 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Hulbert |
2014-02-19 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 21 |
2014-02-19 | House | Amended |
2014-02-19 | House | Authored by Senator David (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-19 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Cleveland, Pittman |
2014-02-19 | House | General Order |
2013-02-28 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Sean) |
2013-02-28 | House | Remove Representative Cox as principal House author and substitute with Representative Hulbert |
2013-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Cox |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 887 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 887 | 17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 887 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |