OK HB1045 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-12 - Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Rural Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-12 - Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Rural Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Animals; modifying regulatory authority for control of dogs running at large. Effective date.
Title
Animals; modifying regulatory authority for control of dogs running at large. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-02-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 71 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2009-02-12 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 71 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2009-02-12 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 71 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-12 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development | |
2009-02-24 | First Reading | |
2009-02-24 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-02-23 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-02-23 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 28 | |
2009-02-23 | Amended | |
2009-02-23 | Authored by Senator Anderson (principal Senate author) | |
2009-02-23 | General Order | |
2009-02-12 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Representative Duncan | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |