OK HB1195 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1195
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-26 - Emergency added
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-26 - Emergency added
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Telecommunications; creating the Secure Telecommunications Act of 2024; effective date; emergency.
Title
Telecommunications; creating the Secure Telecommunications Act of 2024; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-26 | House | Emergency added |
2024-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative McCall |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1195 (Carry Over) 2023-02-07 - Second Reading referred to Rules