OK HB1211 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/25/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/25/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Intoxicating liquors; creating Cody's Law; underage drinking; effective date.
Title
Intoxicating liquors; creating Cody's Law; underage drinking; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Brinkley [R] | Rep. David Brumbaugh [R] | Sen. Kim David [R] | Rep. George Faught [R] |
Rep. Corey Holland [R] | Rep. Sally Kern [R] | Rep. Dan Kirby [R] | Sen. Dan Newberry [R] |
Rep. Jadine Nollan [R] | Rep. Charles Ortega [R] | Rep. Leslie Osborn [R] | Rep. Mike Ritze [R] |
Rep. Todd Russ [R] | Sen. Ralph Shortey [R] | Sen. Frank Simpson [R] | Rep. Kris Steele [R] |
Rep. Todd Thomsen [R] | Rep. Sue Tibbs [R] | Rep. Harold Wright [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-19 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - House - House: (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - House: Conference Committee on Public Safety,: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - House - House: (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - House: Conference Committee on Public Safety,: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | Approved by Governor 05/25/2011 | |
2011-05-19 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-05-19 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-05-19 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2011-05-18 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-05-18 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2011-05-18 | 2 CCR adopted | |
2011-05-17 | 2 CCR read | |
2011-05-17 | To Senate | |
2011-05-17 | Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0 | |
2011-05-17 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Ritze | |
2011-05-17 | 2 CCR adopted | |
2011-05-16 | 2 CCR submitted | |
2011-05-10 | Further conference granted, same conferees | |
2011-05-10 | CCR rejected, further conference requested, same conferees | |
2011-05-05 | CCR submitted | |
2011-05-03 | Conference granted, SCs named Newberry, Barrington, Treat, Brecheen, Burrage, Eason McIntyre | |
2011-04-27 | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Public Safety, Judiciary and Military Affairs | |
2011-04-25 | SA's received | |
2011-04-25 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-04-20 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-20 | Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 | |
2011-04-20 | Title restored | |
2011-04-20 | coauthored by David, Shortey, Brinkley | |
2011-04-20 | General Order, Amended | |
2011-04-20 | Senate Rule suspended | |
2011-04-11 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2011-04-04 | Referred to Appropriations | |
2011-04-04 | coauthored by Simpson | |
2011-04-04 | coauthored by Thomsen, Brumbaugh | |
2011-04-04 | Title stricken | |
2011-04-04 | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-14 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee | |
2011-03-08 | First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-03-07 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-07 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 98 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-07 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Wright, Holland, Faught, Kern, Ortega, Nollan, Tibbs, Russ | |
2011-03-07 | General Order | |
2011-03-01 | Authored by Senator Newberry (principal Senate author) | |
2011-03-01 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Steele, Osborn | |
2011-03-01 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Kirby | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | 163 | 27 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 219 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 241 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 246 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 518 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 8 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |