OK HB1257 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1257
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Counties and county officers; eliminating certain employer contribution cap; effective date.
Title
Counties and county officers; eliminating certain employer contribution cap; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-22 | House | Approved by Governor 04/22/2019 |
2019-04-17 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2019-04-17 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2019-04-16 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2019-02-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-19 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-02-18 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-02-18 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0 |
2019-02-18 | House | General Order |
2019-02-13 | House | Authored by Senator Stanislawski (principal Senate author) |
2019-02-13 | House | CR; Do Pass Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Hilbert |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1257 (Carry Over) 2019-04-22 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2019