OK HB1283 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Approved by Governor 05/06/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Approved by Governor 05/06/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Weights and measures; Department of Labor; compressed natural gas; liquefied natural gas; effective date.
Title
Weights and measures; Department of Labor; compressed natural gas; liquefied natural gas; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-29 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: Energy and Natural Resources Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: Energy and Natural Resources Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | House | Approved by Governor 05/06/2015 |
2015-04-30 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-30 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2015-04-29 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-29 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 0 |
2015-04-29 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2015-04-14 | House | SA's received |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy committee; CR filed |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Smalley; authored by Jolley |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy |
2015-03-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 |
2015-03-09 | House | Amended |
2015-03-09 | House | Authored by Senator Smalley (principal Senate author) |
2015-03-09 | House | General Order |
2015-02-25 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2015-02-16 | House | Referred to Energy and Natural Resources |
2015-02-16 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Cockroft |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |