OK HB1298 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1298
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Professions and occupations; Fire Extinguisher Industry Committee; modifying meeting procedures; effective date.
Title
Professions and occupations; Fire Extinguisher Industry Committee; modifying meeting procedures; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-19 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | House | Approved by Governor 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-23 | House | Sent to Governor |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-23 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2018-04-19 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2018-04-19 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 0 |
2018-04-19 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Pittman |
2018-04-19 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2018-04-18 | House | SA's received |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 1 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Business, Commerce and Tourism committee; CR filed |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2017-02-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-22 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-02-21 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2017-02-21 | House | Authored by Senator Paxton (principal Senate author) |
2017-02-21 | House | General Order |
2017-02-14 | House | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Sears |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1298 (Carry Over) 2017-03-20 - Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism