OK HB1322 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/20/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/20/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Crimes and punishments; providing penalties for embezzlement from an estate; effective date.
Title
Crimes and punishments; providing penalties for embezzlement from an estate; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-16 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - House - House: (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - House - House: Conference Committee on Public Safety,: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - House - House: (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - House - House: Conference Committee on Public Safety,: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | Approved by Governor 05/20/2011 | |
2011-05-17 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-05-17 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-05-17 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2011-05-16 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-05-16 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 38 Nays: 0 | |
2011-05-16 | CCR adopted | |
2011-05-11 | CCR read | |
2011-05-11 | To Senate | |
2011-05-11 | Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 | |
2011-05-11 | CCR adopted | |
2011-05-09 | Title restored | |
2011-05-09 | CCR submitted | |
2011-04-27 | Conference granted, SCs named Schulz, Sykes, Nichols, Crain, Laster, Burrage | |
2011-04-25 | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Public Safety, Judiciary and Military Affairs | |
2011-04-14 | SA's received | |
2011-04-14 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-04-13 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-13 | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 0 | |
2011-04-13 | General Order, Amended | |
2011-03-28 | Title stricken | |
2011-03-28 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-14 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2011-02-23 | First Reading | |
2011-02-23 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-02-22 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-02-22 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 | |
2011-02-22 | General Order | |
2011-02-17 | Authored by Senator Schulz (principal Senate author) | |
2011-02-17 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Wright | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |