OK HB1347 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1347
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-23 - Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Business and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-23 - Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Business and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Medical marijuana; directing the Oklahoma Medical Marijuana Authority to issue requests for proposals; emergency.
Title
Medical marijuana; directing the Oklahoma Medical Marijuana Authority to issue requests for proposals; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Rosecrants |
2023-03-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-08 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-03-07 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-07 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 6 |
2023-03-07 | House | Authored by Senator Garvin (principal Senate author) |
2023-03-07 | House | General Order |
2023-02-23 | House | CR; Do Pass Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Fetgatter |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1347 (Carry Over) 2023-03-23 - Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce Committee then to Appropriations Committee