OK HB1426 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1426
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-29 - Second Reading referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-29 - Second Reading referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; types of employee leave; prohibiting loss or transferability of accumulated sick leave for teachers and support employees due to break in employment; effective date; emergency.
Title
Schools; types of employee leave; prohibiting loss or transferability of accumulated sick leave for teachers and support employees due to break in employment; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Wolfley |
2023-03-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-14 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 5 |
2023-03-13 | House | General Order |
2023-03-02 | House | Title stricken |
2023-03-02 | House | Authored by Senator Stanley (principal Senate author) |
2023-03-02 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Waldron |
2023-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2023-02-20 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee |
2023-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Vancuren |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1426 (Carry Over) 2023-03-29 - Second Reading referred to Education