OK HB1563 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1563
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Elections; procedures relating to presidential elections; effective date.
Title
Elections; procedures relating to presidential elections; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Nathan Dahm [R] | Rep. Jon Echols [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Elections and Ethics Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Elections and Ethics Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-26 | House | Died in conference |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Dahm, Fields, Sykes, Simpson, Thompson, Dossett, Bass |
2017-05-03 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Elections and Ethics |
2017-05-01 | House | SA's received |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 2 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Title restored |
2017-04-27 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Remove as coauthor Senator Paxton |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Paxton |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules committee; CR filed |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2017-03-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-23 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-22 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-22 | House | Title stricken |
2017-03-22 | House | Amended |
2017-03-22 | House | Authored by Senator Dahm (principal Senate author) |
2017-03-22 | House | General Order |
2017-02-15 | House | CR; Do Pass Elections and Ethics Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Elections and Ethics |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Echols |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1563 (Carry Over) 2017-05-26 - Died in conference