OK HB1570 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on April 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-27 - Vetoed 04/24/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Status: Vetoed on April 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-27 - Vetoed 04/24/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Torts; requiring certain affidavit be attached to petition in any civil action for professional negligence. Effective date.
Title
Torts; requiring certain affidavit be attached to petition in any civil action for professional negligence. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 56 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2009-03-10 - House - House: ADVANCE (Y: 51 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2009-03-10 - House - House: ADVANCE (Y: 51 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-27 | Vetoed 04/24/2009 | |
2009-04-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2009-04-20 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2009-04-16 | Referred for enrollment | |
2009-04-15 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2009-04-15 | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2009-04-15 | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version | |
2009-04-15 | Title restored | |
2009-04-15 | Senate Rule suspended | |
2009-04-15 | General Order, Amended | |
2009-04-15 | Backed up to General Order | |
2009-04-15 | Motion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 | |
2009-04-14 | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Paddack | |
2009-04-14 | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2009-04-14 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-04-06 | coauthored by McCullough | |
2009-04-06 | Title stricken | |
2009-04-06 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2009-03-31 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; pending CR | |
2009-03-20 | Pending coauthorship Representative(s) McCullough | |
2009-03-18 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2009-03-11 | First Reading | |
2009-03-11 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-03-10 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-10 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 56 Nays: 38 | |
2009-03-10 | Authored by Senator Paddack (principal Senate author) | |
2009-03-10 | General Order | |
2009-02-19 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Representative Schwartz | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |