OK HB1756 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Peanut Commission; removing authority of the Commissioner of the Oklahoma Department of Agriculture, Food, and Forestry to replace the Oklahoma Peanut Commission if certain conditions are met; repealer; effective date.
Title
Oklahoma Peanut Commission; removing authority of the Commissioner of the Oklahoma Department of Agriculture, Food, and Forestry to replace the Oklahoma Peanut Commission if certain conditions are met; repealer; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Schulz [R] | Rep. John Enns [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Approved by Governor 04/28/2015 |
2015-04-22 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-22 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2015-04-21 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development committee; CR filed |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development |
2015-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-04 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-03 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-03 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 4 |
2015-03-03 | House | General Order |
2015-02-18 | House | Authored by Senator Schulz (principal Senate author) |
2015-02-18 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Rural Development Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Enns |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 18 | 50 | New Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 18 | 51 | New Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 18 | 52 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 18 | 53 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 18 | 54 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 18 | 55 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 18 | 56 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 18 | 57 | New Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 18 | 58 | New Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 18 | 59 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 18 | 62 | New Code | See Bill Text |