OK HB1827 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1827
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Environment and natural resources; state environmental agencies; requiring program for beneficial use of foundry sand; effective date.
Title
Environment and natural resources; state environmental agencies; requiring program for beneficial use of foundry sand; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House: Energy and Natural Resources Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House: Energy and Natural Resources Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-26 | House | Died in conference |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Fields, Marlatt, Thompson, Pederson, Fry, Floyd, Bass |
2017-05-04 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Energy and Natural Resources |
2017-05-01 | House | SA's received |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Energy committee; CR filed |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy |
2017-03-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-21 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-20 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-20 | House | Authored by Senator Fields (principal Senate author) |
2017-03-20 | House | General Order |
2017-02-23 | House | CR; Do Pass Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Energy and Natural Resources |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Pfeiffer |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1827 (Carry Over) 2017-05-26 - Died in conference