OK HB1887 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Criminal procedure; modifying definition of eligible offender for community punishments. Effective date.
Title
Criminal procedure; modifying definition of eligible offender for community punishments. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-02-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2009-03-02 | First Reading | |
2009-03-02 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-02-26 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-02-26 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 3 | |
2009-02-26 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sherrer | |
2009-02-26 | General Order | |
2009-02-19 | Authored by Senator Gumm (principal Senate author) | |
2009-02-19 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Kiesel | |
2009-02-19 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Representative Richardson | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 988 | 16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 988 | 18 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 988 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 988 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |