OK HB2090 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; limiting duration of future sales tax exemptions. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Revenue and taxation; limiting duration of future sales tax exemptions. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-03-11 - House - House: AMENDMENT (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-03-11 - House - House: AMENDMENT (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-18 | Second Reading referred to Finance | |
2009-03-12 | First Reading | |
2009-03-12 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-03-11 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-11 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 9 | |
2009-03-11 | Title stricken | |
2009-03-11 | Amended | |
2009-03-11 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Tibbs | |
2009-03-11 | General Order | |
2009-02-26 | Authored by Senator Stanislawski (principal Senate author) | |
2009-02-26 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sherrer | |
2009-02-26 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Representative Kirby | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
68 | 1354A | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
68 | 1356 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
68 | 1357 | New Code | See Bill Text |