OK HB2134 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Elections; modifying requirements for formation of political party; effective date.
Title
Elections; modifying requirements for formation of political party; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 74 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 74 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | House | Died in conference |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Marlatt, Griffin, Holt, Ford, Bass, McAffrey |
2014-05-08 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Rules |
2014-04-24 | House | SA's received |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-04-23 | Senate | remove as principal author Representative Hickman and substitute with Representative Echols |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 28 Nays: 16 |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Title restored |
2014-04-23 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2014-03-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-17 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 11 |
2014-03-13 | House | Amended |
2014-03-13 | House | Authored by Senator Marlatt (principal Senate author) |
2014-03-13 | House | General Order |
2013-02-20 | House | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Hickman |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
26 | 1 | 108 | New Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 1 | 109 | New Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 10 | 101 | New Code | See Bill Text |