OK HB2189 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-24 - Pending coauthorship Representative(s) McDaniel (Randy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-24 - Pending coauthorship Representative(s) McDaniel (Randy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; relates to the United States Flag; providing that the Pledge of Allegiance to the Flag of the United States of America be recited once daily in a classroom during each school day; relates to the flag of the State of Oklahoma; providing that the official salute to the flag of the State of Oklahoma be recited once daily in a classroom during each school day. Effective date.
Title
Schools; relates to the United States Flag; providing that the Pledge of Allegiance to the Flag of the United States of America be recited once daily in a classroom during each school day; relates to the flag of the State of Oklahoma; providing that the official salute to the flag of the State of Oklahoma be recited once daily in a classroom during each school day. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Dorman [D] | Rep. George Faught [R] | Rep. Sally Kern [R] | Rep. Jeannie McDaniel [D] |
Rep. Ryan McMullen [D] | Rep. Lewis Moore [R] | Rep. Jason Nelson [R] | Sen. Steve Russell [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2009-03-12 - House - House: (Y: 7 N: 89 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2009-03-12 - House - House: ADVANCE (Y: 8 N: 88 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2009-03-12 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 21 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2009-03-12 - House - House: (Y: 7 N: 89 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2009-03-12 - House - House: ADVANCE (Y: 8 N: 88 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2009-03-12 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 21 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-24 | Pending coauthorship Representative(s) McDaniel (Randy) | |
2009-03-18 | Second Reading referred to Education | |
2009-03-16 | First Reading | |
2009-03-16 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-03-12 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-12 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0 | |
2009-03-12 | Amended by floor substitute | |
2009-03-12 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Nelson, Dorman, Faught, McMullen | |
2009-03-12 | General Order | |
2009-02-26 | Authored by Senator Russell (principal Senate author) | |
2009-02-26 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Kern, McDaniel (Jeannie) | |
2009-02-26 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Representative Moore | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
25 | 91 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 91 | 4 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 91 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 24 | 106 | New Code | See Bill Text |