OK HB2395 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/09/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/09/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
State Auditor and Inspector; specifying requirements for certain financial statements; audits; modifying certain fee; modifying amounts to be deposited to State Auditor and Inspector Revolving Fund and General Revenue Fund. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
State Auditor and Inspector; specifying requirements for certain financial statements; audits; modifying certain fee; modifying amounts to be deposited to State Auditor and Inspector Revolving Fund and General Revenue Fund. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-27 - House - House: (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 70 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 70 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Approved by Governor 06/09/2010 | |
2010-05-28 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-28 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-05-28 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-05-28 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-28 | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 34 Nays: 10 | |
2010-05-28 | Ayes: 35 Nays: 9 | |
2010-05-28 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2010-05-28 | CCR read, GCCA | |
2010-05-27 | To Senate | |
2010-05-27 | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 4 | |
2010-05-27 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-26 | Enacting clause restored | |
2010-05-26 | Title restored | |
2010-05-26 | CCR submitted | |
2010-04-27 | HC's named: Liebmann, Martin (Scott), Martin (Steve), Pruett, Hickman, Denney, Schwartz, Shannon, Miller, Carey, Luttrell | |
2010-04-19 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2010-04-15 | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2010-04-05 | SA's received | |
2010-04-05 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-03-31 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-31 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 | |
2010-03-31 | remove as principal author Representative Miller and substitute with Representative Liebmann | |
2010-03-31 | Remove as author Representative Martin (Scott) | |
2010-03-31 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2010-03-31 | General Order, Amended | |
2010-03-31 | Pending removal principal author Representative Miller and replace with Representative Liebmann | |
2010-03-31 | Pending Removal of Author Representative Martin (Scott) | |
2010-02-09 | Direct to Calendar | |
2010-02-04 | First Reading | |
2010-02-04 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-02-03 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-02-03 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 25 | |
2010-02-03 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-03 | Amended | |
2010-02-03 | General Order | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading, direct to Calendar | |
2010-02-01 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Myers | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Johnson (Mike) (principal Senate author) | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Miller, Martin (Scott) | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 18 | 194 | New Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 18 | 314 | New Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 3 | 50 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27A | 2 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27A | 2 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
3A | 208 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 1104 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
52 | 288 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 167 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
57 | 537 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
57 | 539 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
59 | 1000 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1694 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
59 | 328 | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 475 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 587 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
59 | 858 | 205 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 211 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 3221 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 485 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 315 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 128 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 130 | 22 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 19a | New Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 212 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 212A | New Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 217 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 227 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 5060 | 22 | New Code | See Bill Text |
86 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |