OK HB2408 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Ethics Commission; relating to the Political Subdivisions Ethics Act; modifying duties of the Ethics Commission; modifying where fees are deposited; relating to penalties and reporting requirements. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Ethics Commission; relating to the Political Subdivisions Ethics Act; modifying duties of the Ethics Commission; modifying where fees are deposited; relating to penalties and reporting requirements. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-28 - House - House: (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 69 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 69 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Approved by Governor 06/10/2010 | |
2010-05-28 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-28 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-05-28 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-05-28 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-28 | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-28 | 2 CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2010-05-28 | 2 CCR read, GCCA | |
2010-05-28 | To Senate | |
2010-05-28 | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 100 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-28 | 2 CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2010-05-26 | 2 CCR submitted, GCCA | |
2010-05-26 | Further conference granted, GCCA | |
2010-05-26 | CCR rejected, further conference requested, GCCA | |
2010-05-25 | Enacting clause restored | |
2010-05-25 | Title restored | |
2010-05-25 | CCR submitted, GCCA | |
2010-05-06 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2010-04-15 | SA's rejected, conference requested, GCCA | |
2010-04-05 | SA's received | |
2010-04-05 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-03-31 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-31 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2010-03-31 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2010-03-31 | General Order, Amended | |
2010-02-09 | Direct to Calendar | |
2010-02-04 | First Reading | |
2010-02-04 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-02-03 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-02-03 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 23 | |
2010-02-03 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-03 | Amended | |
2010-02-03 | General Order | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading, direct to Calendar | |
2010-02-01 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Myers | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Johnson (Mike) (principal Senate author) | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Miller, Martin (Scott) | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
51 | 305 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
51 | 305 | 1 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 4256 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
86 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |