OK HB2497 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; directing the State Department of Education promulgate rules establishing limited exemptions from certain testing; directing to conduct a study of reading instruction and retention of students; emergency.
Title
Schools; directing the State Department of Education promulgate rules establishing limited exemptions from certain testing; directing to conduct a study of reading instruction and retention of students; emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Stanislawski [R] | Rep. Dennis Casey [R] | Rep. Ann Coody [R] | Rep. Sally Kern [R] |
Sen. Constance Johnson [D] | Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] | Rep. Jadine Nollan [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | House | Approved by Governor 05/28/2014 |
2014-05-23 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-05-23 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-05-23 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2014-05-23 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2014-05-21 | Senate | CCR read |
2014-05-21 | House | To Senate |
2014-05-21 | House | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 |
2014-05-21 | House | CCR adopted |
2014-05-21 | House | CCR considered |
2014-05-15 | House | Laid over |
2014-05-15 | House | CCR considered |
2014-05-14 | House | CCR submitted |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Stanislawski, Ford, Jolley, Halligan, Paddack, Sparks |
2014-05-06 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Common Education |
2014-04-16 | House | SA's received |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2014-04-03 | Senate | coauthored by Johnson (Constance) |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2014-02-19 | Senate | coauthored by Nollan |
2014-02-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-19 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-02-18 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-02-18 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0 |
2014-02-18 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Coody, Pittman |
2014-02-18 | House | General Order |
2014-02-11 | House | Authored by Senator Stanislawski (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Kern |
2014-02-11 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Casey |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 1210 | 508 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 1210 | 508C | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 1210 | 508G | Amended Code | See Bill Text |