OK HB2605 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2605
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by Governor 04/18/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by Governor 04/18/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Guardian and ward; including court determination for capacity of ward to receive hospice program services; effective date.
Title
Guardian and ward; including court determination for capacity of ward to receive hospice program services; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Sherrie Conley [R] | Sen. Greg McCortney [R] | Rep. Jon Echols [R] | Rep. Cyndi Munson [D] |
Rep. Mark Lawson [R] | Rep. Toni Hasenbeck [R] | Sen. Rob Standridge [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Approved by Governor 04/18/2019 |
2019-04-15 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2019-04-15 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2019-03-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-14 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-13 | House | Amended |
2019-03-13 | House | House Rule suspended |
2019-03-13 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Standridge |
2019-03-13 | House | Authored by Senator McCortney (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-13 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Echols, Munson, Lawson, Hasenbeck |
2019-03-13 | House | Remove Representative Echols as principal House author and substitute with Representative Conley |
2019-03-13 | House | General Order |
2019-02-07 | House | CR; Do Pass Children, Youth and Family Services Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Children, Youth and Family Services |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Echols |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2605 (Carry Over) 2019-04-18 - Approved by Governor 04/18/2019