OK HB2641 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-14 - Approved by Governor 05/14/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-14 - Approved by Governor 05/14/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; family and societal issues on students; counseling curriculum; effective date.
Title
Schools; family and societal issues on students; counseling curriculum; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-07 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 46 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2012-05-07 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 54 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Senate: RECONSIDER (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 70 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Education: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-07 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 54 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Senate: RECONSIDER (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 70 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Education: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-14 | Approved by Governor 05/14/2012 | |
2012-05-08 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-08 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-05-08 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-05-07 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-07 | Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 54 Nays: 33; Ayes: 46 Nays: 34 | |
2012-05-07 | SA's read, adopted | |
2012-04-30 | SA's received | |
2012-04-30 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-04-25 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-25 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 4 | |
2012-04-25 | Title restored | |
2012-04-25 | Enacting clause restored | |
2012-04-25 | Senate Rule suspended | |
2012-04-25 | Backed up to General Order | |
2012-04-25 | Motion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 42 Nays: 3 | |
2012-04-25 | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure and emergency Halligan | |
2012-04-25 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 3 | |
2012-04-25 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-04-09 | coauthored by Williams | |
2012-04-09 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-26 | Referred to Appropriations | |
2012-03-26 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2012-03-26 | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-15 | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee | |
2012-03-12 | First Reading | |
2012-03-12 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-08 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 15 | |
2012-03-08 | General Order | |
2012-02-29 | Title stricken | |
2012-02-29 | Authored by Senator Halligan (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-29 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Denney | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 1210 | 241 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 1210 | 242 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 1210 | 243 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |