OK HB2667 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Approved by Governor 06/03/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Approved by Governor 06/03/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Children; relating to termination of parental rights; modifying listed acts requiring termination; effective date.
Title
Children; relating to termination of parental rights; modifying listed acts requiring termination; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-23 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House: Judiciary Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House: Judiciary Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | House | Approved by Governor 06/03/2014 |
2014-05-23 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-05-23 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-05-23 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 |
2014-05-23 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2014-05-16 | Senate | CCR read |
2014-05-16 | House | To Senate |
2014-05-16 | House | Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 7 |
2014-05-16 | House | CCR adopted |
2014-05-07 | House | Title restored |
2014-05-07 | House | CCR submitted |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Sykes, Griffin, Allen, Branan, Burrage, Ivester |
2014-04-29 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary |
2014-04-22 | House | SA's received |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1 |
2014-04-21 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-04-01 | Senate | coauthored by Ivester |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2014-03-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-17 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-13 | House | Motion expired |
2014-03-12 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Derby |
2014-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 3 |
2014-03-12 | House | Authored by Senator Sykes (principal Senate author) |
2014-03-12 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McCullough |
2014-03-12 | House | General Order |
2014-02-19 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Derby |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10A | 1 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 4 | 902 | New Code | See Bill Text |