OK HB2692 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Child care; allowing director to qualify as a master teacher; providing probationary period for master teacher to fulfill educational qualifications; effective date.
Title
Child care; allowing director to qualify as a master teacher; providing probationary period for master teacher to fulfill educational qualifications; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | House | Approved by Governor 04/24/2018 |
2018-04-18 | House | Sent to Governor |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-18 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2018-04-17 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 25 Nays: 15 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2018-03-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-05 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 1 |
2018-03-05 | House | Authored by Senator Standridge (principal Senate author) |
2018-03-05 | House | General Order |
2018-02-14 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Children, Youth and Family Services Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Children, Youth and Family Services |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Dunlap |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |