OK HB2843 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public health; which relates to the tumor registry; making the reporting of certain data and information relating to tumor patients mandatory; effective date.
Title
Public health; which relates to the tumor registry; making the reporting of certain data and information relating to tumor patients mandatory; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 34 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | House | Approved by Governor 04/25/2018 |
2018-04-19 | House | Sent to Governor |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-19 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2018-04-18 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 9 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-19 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-15 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0 |
2018-03-15 | House | Amended |
2018-03-15 | House | House Rule suspended |
2018-03-15 | House | Authored by Senator Pemberton (principal Senate author) |
2018-03-15 | House | General Order |
2018-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Meredith |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 1 | 551 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 1 | 559 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |