OK HB2928 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/08/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/08/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; gross production tax; modifying termination dates for certain allocations; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; gross production tax; modifying termination dates for certain allocations; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-01 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Revenue & Taxation: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Revenue & Taxation: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-08 | Approved by Governor 05/08/2012 | |
2012-05-02 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-02 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-05-02 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-05-01 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-01 | Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 1 | |
2012-05-01 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Cooksey | |
2012-05-01 | SA's read, adopted | |
2012-04-23 | SA's received | |
2012-04-23 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-04-19 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-19 | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-19 | Title restored | |
2012-04-19 | General Order, Amended | |
2012-04-04 | Title stricken | |
2012-04-04 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-21 | Second Reading referred to Finance | |
2012-03-14 | First Reading | |
2012-03-14 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-13 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-13 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 8 | |
2012-03-13 | General Order | |
2012-02-28 | Authored by Senator Justice (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-28 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman | |
2012-02-28 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Armes | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |