OK HB3293 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Approved by Governor 06/03/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Approved by Governor 06/03/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
State employee pay; creating the State Employee Compensation Program; sick leave rates; pay bands; effective date; emergency.
Title
State employee pay; creating the State Employee Compensation Program; sick leave rates; pay bands; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Clark Jolley [R] | Rep. Leslie Osborn [R] | Rep. Lisa Billy [R] | Rep. Pat Ownbey [R] |
Rep. Sean Roberts [R] | Rep. Charles McCall [R] | Rep. Justin Wood [R] | Rep. Mark McBride [R] |
Rep. Ken Walker [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | House | Approved by Governor 06/03/2014 |
2014-05-21 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-05-21 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-05-20 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-20 | House | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 |
2014-05-20 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Wood, Roberts (Sean) |
2014-05-20 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2014-04-24 | House | SA's received |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Title restored |
2014-04-23 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2014-03-12 | Senate | coauthored by Billy |
2014-03-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-12 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-11 | House | Amended |
2014-03-11 | House | House Rule suspended |
2014-03-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McCall, Ownbey, McBride, Walker |
2014-03-11 | House | General Order |
2014-02-25 | House | Title stricken |
2014-02-25 | House | Authored by Senator Jolley (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-25 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2014-02-19 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2014-02-19 | House | Withdrawn from Government Modernization Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Government Modernization |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Osborn |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 2 | 103a | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 840 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 840 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |