OK HB3510 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Approved by Governor 06/03/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Approved by Governor 06/03/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Crimes and punishments; clarifying justifiable homicide provisions; emergency.
Title
Crimes and punishments; clarifying justifiable homicide provisions; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeffrey Hickman [R] | Sen. Brian Bingman [R] | Rep. Mike Ritze [R] | Sen. David Holt [R] |
Rep. Terry O'Donnell [R] | Rep. Michael Turner [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | House | Approved by Governor 06/03/2014 |
2014-05-23 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-05-23 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-05-23 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 2 |
2014-05-23 | Senate | JCR adopted |
2014-05-22 | Senate | coauthored by Holt |
2014-05-19 | Senate | remove as principal author Representative Hickman and substitute with Representative ODonnell |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2014-05-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-05-15 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-05-15 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-05-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 8; Ayes: 76 Nays: 10 |
2014-05-15 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) ODonnell, Turner, Ritze |
2014-05-15 | House | General Order |
2014-05-13 | House | Second Reading, direct to Calendar |
2014-05-12 | House | Authored by Senator Bingman (principal Senate author) |
2014-05-12 | House | Authored by Representative Hickman |
2014-05-12 | House | First Reading |