OK HJR1026 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 46-8)
Status: Failed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 46-8)
Status: Failed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Constitutional amendment; clarifying manner in which citizens may keep and bear arms; ballot title; filing.
Title
Constitutional amendment; clarifying manner in which citizens may keep and bear arms; ballot title; filing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-26 - House - House: States' Rights Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | House | Died in conference |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Treat, Griffin, Schulz, Barrington, Burrage, Sparks |
2014-04-29 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on States Rights |
2014-04-24 | House | SA's received |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 6 |
2014-04-23 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-04-22 | Senate | coauthored by Jolley |
2014-04-15 | Senate | coauthored by Ivester |
2014-04-14 | Senate | coauthored by Dorman |
2014-04-14 | Senate | coauthored by Standridge |
2014-04-09 | Senate | coauthored by Shannon |
2014-04-07 | Senate | coauthored by Marlatt |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed |
2014-03-26 | Senate | coauthored by Shortey |
2014-03-26 | Senate | coauthored by Brumbaugh, Cleveland |
2014-03-24 | Senate | coauthored by Brinkley, Newberry, Stanislawski |
2014-03-19 | Senate | coauthored by Derby, Johnson, Echols |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2014-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 7 |
2014-03-12 | House | Amended |
2014-03-12 | House | House Rule suspended |
2014-03-12 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Anderson, Dahm, Holt, Brecheen, Sharp, Allen, Griffin |
2014-03-12 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Christian, Murphey, Roberts (Sean), Walker, Cockroft, Wood, Blackwell, Osborn, Enns, Moore, Wesselhoft, Newell, Sears, Vaughan, Ritze, Reynolds, Schwartz, Scott, Grau, McDaniel (Randy), Pittman, McCullough, Sherrer, Inman, Proctor, Hoskin, Martin (Steve), Turner |
2014-03-12 | House | General Order |
2013-02-28 | House | Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author) |
2013-02-28 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Bennett |
2013-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute States' Rights Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to States' Rights |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Fisher, Kern |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |