OK HJR1092 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Constitutional amendment; Oklahoma Public Welfare Commission; authorizing the Legislature to create a department to provide for public welfare; ballot title; filing.
Title
Constitutional amendment; Oklahoma Public Welfare Commission; authorizing the Legislature to create a department to provide for public welfare; ballot title; filing.
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Brinkley [R] | Sen. Constance Johnson [D] | Rep. Jason Nelson [R] | Rep. Pat Ownbey [R] |
Rep. Pam Peterson [R] | Rep. Wade Rousselot [D] | Rep. Kris Steele [R] | Sen. Greg Treat [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-22 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 80 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - House - House: Conference Committee on Government Modernization: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - House - House: Conference Committee on Government Modernization: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2012-05-25 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-05-25 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-05-24 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-24 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0 | |
2012-05-24 | coauthored by Brinkley, Johnson (Constance) | |
2012-05-24 | CCR adopted | |
2012-05-22 | CCR read | |
2012-05-22 | To Senate | |
2012-05-22 | Motion to reconsider tabled | |
2012-05-22 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Nelson | |
2012-05-22 | Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 7 | |
2012-05-22 | CCR adopted | |
2012-05-21 | Resolving clause restored | |
2012-05-21 | Title restored | |
2012-05-21 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Peterson | |
2012-05-21 | CCR submitted | |
2012-05-08 | Conference granted, SCs named Treat, Johnson (Rob), Crain, Bingman, Burrage, Ballenger | |
2012-05-02 | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Government Modernization and Rules | |
2012-04-24 | SA's received | |
2012-04-24 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-04-23 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-23 | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1 | |
2012-04-23 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-04-09 | Resolving clause stricken | |
2012-04-09 | Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-21 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2012-03-14 | First Reading | |
2012-03-14 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-13 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-13 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 3 | |
2012-03-13 | Title stricken | |
2012-03-13 | Amended | |
2012-03-13 | General Order | |
2012-02-29 | Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-29 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Rousselot, Nelson, Ownbey | |
2012-02-29 | Remove Representative Nelson as principal House author and substitute with Representative Steele | |
2012-02-29 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Nelson | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |