OK SB1218 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/08/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/08/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Alcoholic beverages; authorizing waiver to certain prohibition for certain purposes. Effective date.
Title
Alcoholic beverages; authorizing waiver to certain prohibition for certain purposes. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 51 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 63 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 51 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 63 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-08 | Approved by Governor 05/08/2012 | |
2012-05-02 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-02 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-05-02 | Enrolled, to House | |
2012-05-01 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-01 | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 | |
2012-05-01 | HAs adopted | |
2012-04-17 | HAs read | |
2012-04-17 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-16 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-16 | Motion expired | |
2012-04-11 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative McDaniel (Randy) | |
2012-04-11 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 63 Nays: 29; Ayes: 51 Nays: 30 | |
2012-04-11 | Amended | |
2012-04-11 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Cooksey | |
2012-04-11 | General Order | |
2012-03-29 | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2012-03-08 | First Reading | |
2012-03-08 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-03-07 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-07 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-07 | coauthored by Johnson (Constance) | |
2012-03-07 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-02-23 | coauthored by McDaniel (Randy) (principal House author) | |
2012-02-23 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Holt | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | 163 | 27 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 518 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |