OK SB1314 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; directing school district boards of education to adopt a phone-free campus policy. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Schools; directing school district boards of education to adopt a phone-free campus policy. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Pugh [R] | Rep. Chad Caldwell [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Education: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Education: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-28 | Senate | Title stricken |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Caldwell (Chad) (principal House author) |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Title stricken |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Pugh |
2024-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |