OK SB1366 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/08/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/08/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Advance directives; clarifying applicability of certain directive. Effective date.
Title
Advance directives; clarifying applicability of certain directive. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-02 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-02 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-08 | Approved by Governor 05/08/2012 | |
2012-05-03 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-03 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-05-03 | Enrolled, to House | |
2012-05-02 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-02 | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 | |
2012-05-02 | HAs adopted | |
2012-04-25 | HAs read | |
2012-04-25 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-24 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-24 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-24 | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDaniel (Jeannie) | |
2012-04-24 | General Order | |
2012-04-03 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2012-03-15 | First Reading | |
2012-03-15 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-03-14 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-14 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-14 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-02-28 | coauthored by Sherrer (principal House author) | |
2012-02-28 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Ivester | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43A | 11 | 107 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 3101 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |