OK SB1797 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/08/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/08/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; creating the Commission for Education Quality and Accountability to assume roles of multiple entities. Effective dates.
Title
Schools; creating the Commission for Education Quality and Accountability to assume roles of multiple entities. Effective dates.
Sponsors
Rep. Lee Denney [R] | Sen. Clark Jolley [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 61 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Education: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 61 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Education: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-08 | Approved by Governor 05/08/2012 | |
2012-05-02 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-02 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-05-02 | Enrolled, to House | |
2012-05-01 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-01 | Measure passed: Ayes: 25 Nays: 15 | |
2012-05-01 | HAs adopted | |
2012-04-30 | HAs read | |
2012-04-26 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-25 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-25 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 61 Nays: 22 | |
2012-04-25 | Amended | |
2012-04-25 | General Order | |
2012-04-12 | Title restored | |
2012-04-12 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2012-03-14 | First Reading | |
2012-03-14 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-03-13 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-13 | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-13 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-03-01 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-21 | Referred to Appropriations | |
2012-02-21 | coauthored by Denney (principal House author) | |
2012-02-21 | Title stricken | |
2012-02-21 | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Jolley | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 1210 | 508 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 1210 | 531 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 1210 | 541 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 180 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 3 | 116 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 3 | 117 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 3 | 118 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 6 | 182 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 6 | 183 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 6 | 184 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 6 | 185 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 6 | 187 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 6 | 188 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 6 | 198 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 6 | 199 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 6 | 200 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 6 | 201 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 6 | 202 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 6 | 205 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |