OK SB1956 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Agriculture; relating to the Agriculture Mediation Program; creating the Agriculture Mediation Board.
Title
Agriculture; relating to the Agriculture Mediation Program; creating the Agriculture Mediation Board.
Sponsors
Rep. Don Armes [R] | Sen. Ron Justice [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-24 - House - House: (Y: 88 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2010-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-04-07 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-04-07 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Approved by Governor 06/06/2010 | |
2010-05-25 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-25 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-05-25 | Enrolled, to House | |
2010-05-24 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-24 | To Senate | |
2010-05-24 | Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 6 | |
2010-05-24 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-17 | CCR submitted | |
2010-05-17 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-17 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-05 | CCR read | |
2010-04-29 | Conference granted, HC's named Armes, DeWitt, Enns, Rousselot, Richardson, Kouplen | |
2010-04-26 | SCs named Justice, Schulz, Anderson, Marlatt, Ellis | |
2010-04-21 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2010-04-20 | HAs read | |
2010-04-20 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-19 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-19 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 3 | |
2010-04-19 | General Order | |
2010-04-07 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Rural Development Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development | |
2010-02-25 | First Reading | |
2010-02-25 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-02-24 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-02-24 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2010-02-24 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-02-16 | coauthored by Armes (principal House author) | |
2010-02-16 | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-16 | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-08 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Armes | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Justice | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 30 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 3430 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |