OK SB1961 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Vetoed 06/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Status: Vetoed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Vetoed 06/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Employment discrimination; modifying language. Effective date.
Title
Employment discrimination; modifying language. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-25 - House - House: (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-03-29 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 70 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-03-22 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-29 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 70 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-03-22 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Vetoed 06/10/2010 | |
2010-05-28 | Veto message read | |
2010-05-26 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-26 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-05-26 | Enrolled, to House | |
2010-05-25 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-25 | To Senate | |
2010-05-25 | Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 2 | |
2010-05-25 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-24 | CCR submitted | |
2010-05-24 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 42 Nays: 1 | |
2010-05-24 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-20 | Enacting clause restored | |
2010-05-20 | Title restored | |
2010-05-20 | CCR read | |
2010-04-27 | Conference granted, HC's named Sullivan, Duncan, Jordan, McCullough, Morrissette, Lamons | |
2010-04-13 | SCs named Jolley, Anderson, Crain, Johnson (Mike) | |
2010-04-12 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2010-03-30 | HAs read | |
2010-03-30 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-29 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-29 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 28 | |
2010-03-29 | General Order | |
2010-03-23 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2010-03-23 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Judiciary Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2010-03-10 | First Reading | |
2010-03-10 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-03-09 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-09 | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2010-03-09 | coauthored by Johnson (Constance) | |
2010-03-09 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-02-18 | coauthored by Sullivan (principal House author) | |
2010-02-18 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-18 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-16 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-16 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Sullivan | |
2010-02-15 | Referred to Judiciary | |
2010-02-15 | Withdrawn from Rules committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Jolley | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
25 | 1101 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
25 | 1301 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
25 | 1302 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
25 | 1303 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
25 | 1304 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
25 | 1305 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
25 | 1306 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
25 | 1308 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
25 | 1309 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
25 | 1310 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
25 | 1350 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
25 | 1402 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
25 | 1451 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
25 | 1452 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
25 | 1453 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
25 | 1506 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1702 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
25 | 1703 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
25 | 1704 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
25 | 1705 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
25 | 1901 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |