OK SB1983 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 25 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-25 - Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Status: Enrolled on May 25 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-25 - Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Motor vehicle registration fee; clarifying exceptions to penalties for delinquent payment. Effective date.
Title
Motor vehicle registration fee; clarifying exceptions to penalties for delinquent payment. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 67 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - House - House: PREVIOUS QUESTION (Y: 55 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - House - House: TABLE PREVIOUS QUESTION (Y: 10 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [FAIL]
2012-05-25 - House - House: ADOPT JCR (Y: 29 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2012-05-25 - House - House: MOTION TO RESCIND (Y: 58 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-21 - House - House: Joint Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - House - House: PREVIOUS QUESTION (Y: 55 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - House - House: TABLE PREVIOUS QUESTION (Y: 10 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [FAIL]
2012-05-25 - House - House: ADOPT JCR (Y: 29 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2012-05-25 - House - House: MOTION TO RESCIND (Y: 58 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-21 - House - House: Joint Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-25 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-05-25 | Enrolled, to House | |
2012-05-25 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-25 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-05-25 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 24 | |
2012-05-25 | Ayes: 68 Nays: 15 | |
2012-05-25 | JCR adopted | |
2012-05-25 | Ayes: 58 Nays: 9 | |
2012-05-25 | Rescind vote on JCR | |
2012-05-25 | Laid over | |
2012-05-25 | Ayes: 29 Nays: 62 | |
2012-05-25 | JCR failed of adoption | |
2012-05-25 | General Order | |
2012-05-23 | Second Reading, direct to Joint Calendar | |
2012-05-22 | First Reading | |
2012-05-22 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-05-22 | Emergency failed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 15 | |
2012-05-22 | Measure passed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 15 | |
2012-05-22 | JCR adopted | |
2012-05-21 | Emergency added | |
2012-05-21 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget committee; JCR filed | |
2012-05-09 | Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget | |
2012-05-08 | coauthored by Martin (Scott) | |
2012-05-08 | coauthored by Sears (principal House author) | |
2012-05-08 | coauthored by Justice | |
2012-05-08 | Authored by Senator Jolley | |
2012-05-08 | First Reading |