OK SB2235 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Children; relating to the emergency custody of children; providing procedures. Effective date.
Title
Children; relating to the emergency custody of children; providing procedures. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-25 - House - House: (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2010-03-22 - House - House: Human Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2010-03-22 - House - House: Human Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Approved by Governor 06/06/2010 | |
2010-05-26 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-26 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-05-26 | Enrolled, to House | |
2010-05-25 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-25 | To Senate | |
2010-05-25 | Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-25 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-24 | CCR submitted | |
2010-05-24 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-24 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-20 | CCR read | |
2010-05-06 | Conference granted, HC's named Sullivan, Tibbs, Kern, Peterson, McDaniel (Jeannie), Peters, Rousselot | |
2010-05-05 | SCs named Crain, Anderson, Lamb, Laster, Burrage | |
2010-05-04 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2010-04-07 | HAs read | |
2010-04-07 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-06 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-06 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-06 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Tibbs | |
2010-04-06 | General Order | |
2010-03-23 | Title restored | |
2010-03-23 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Kern | |
2010-03-23 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Human Services Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Human Services | |
2010-03-03 | First Reading | |
2010-03-03 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-03-02 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-02 | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2010-03-02 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-02-22 | coauthored by Sullivan (principal House author) | |
2010-02-22 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-22 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-18 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Sullivan | |
2010-02-16 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Crain | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 1150 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 1 | 4 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 107 | 4 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 120 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |