OK SB943 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Income tax refund donations; authorizing donation to Oklahoma AIDS Care Revolving Fund; creating revolving fund. Effective date.
Title
Income tax refund donations; authorizing donation to Oklahoma AIDS Care Revolving Fund; creating revolving fund. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-16 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2018-04-23 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2018-04-19 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2018-04-19 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 12 |
2018-04-19 | House | General Order |
2018-04-16 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2018-03-29 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee |
2018-03-20 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee |
2018-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2018-03-08 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 5 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Title restored |
2018-03-07 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Remove as coauthor Senator David |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator David |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-Finance sub-committee |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Appr/Sub-Finance |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Floyd |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |