OK SJR91 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-24 - Approved by Governor 05/24/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-24 - Approved by Governor 05/24/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Joint Resolution approving permanent rules relating to the Department of Environmental Quality; directing distribution.
Title
Joint Resolution approving permanent rules relating to the Department of Environmental Quality; directing distribution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 53 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - House - House: Administrative Rules & Government Oversight: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - House - House: Administrative Rules & Government Oversight: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-24 | Approved by Governor 05/24/2012 | |
2012-05-22 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-22 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-05-22 | Enrolled, to House | |
2012-05-21 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-21 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-05-21 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Scott | |
2012-05-21 | Motion expired | |
2012-05-17 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Reynolds | |
2012-05-17 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 53 Nays: 20 | |
2012-05-17 | General Order | |
2012-05-14 | CR; Do Pass Administrative Rules and Government Oversight Committee | |
2012-05-10 | Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules and Government Oversight | |
2012-05-09 | First Reading | |
2012-05-09 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-05-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-05-08 | Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 6 | |
2012-05-08 | Emergency removed | |
2012-05-08 | General Order, Amended | |
2012-05-03 | coauthored by Fields | |
2012-05-03 | Reported Do Pass Energy committee; CR filed | |
2012-04-17 | Second Reading referred to Energy | |
2012-04-09 | coauthored by Virgin (principal House author) | |
2012-04-09 | Authored by Senator Paddack | |
2012-04-09 | First Reading |