OR HB2266 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Chapter 484, (2019 Laws): Effective date June 25, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Chapter 484, (2019 Laws): Effective date June 25, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Public Employees' Benefit Board and Oregon Educators Benefit Board to impose surcharge on eligible employee who arranges coverage for spouse or dependent with access to medical coverage as employee in health benefit plan offered by Public Employees' Benefit Board or Oregon Educators Benefit Board. Requires Oregon Health Policy Board to study changes in health care coverage in Oregon since implementation of Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act and report results of study to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to health.] Directs Public Employees' Benefit Board and Oregon Educators Benefit Board to conduct audit of spouse or dependent coverage eligibility as frequently as is recommended by consultants engaged by boards. Provides that caps on reimbursements of cost of hospital services or supplies provided to enrollees in health benefit plans offered by Public Employees' Benefit Board and Oregon Educators Benefit Board do not apply to reimbursements paid to hospitals located outside of this state. Directs Oregon Health Authority to report to committees or interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to health care on certain topics related to Public Employees' Benefit Board and Oregon Educators Benefit Board. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to health care; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | House | Chapter 484, (2019 Laws): Effective date June 25, 2019. |
2019-06-25 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-19 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Baertschiger Jr. Passed. Ayes, 29. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-06-06 | House | Third reading. Carried by Salinas. Passed. Ayes, 55; Nays, 3--Bonham, Hayden, Nearman; Excused, 2--Greenlick, Marsh. |
2019-06-05 | House | Second reading. |
2019-06-04 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-06-04 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-06-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred to Rules by order of Speaker. |
2019-04-09 | House | Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules. |
2019-04-02 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |