OR SB130 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Oregon Health Authority to award grant moneys to eligible school-based health center pilot projects to expand access to health care services and improve health and education outcomes for students through telehealth. Authorizes school nurse associated with school-based health center to engage in practice of telehealth. Directs State Board of Education to adopt rules related to telehealth.] Defines "telehealth." Establishes eligibility criteria for pilot projects. Directs authority to report to interim committee of Legislative Assembly on effectiveness and success of pilot projects not later than December 31, 2023. Sunsets January 2, 2024. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to school nurses; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |