OR SB612 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Expands Department of Transportation's authority to provide expedited services related to vehicle titling.
Title
Relating to expedited services provided by the Department of Transportation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-06-10 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development. |
2013-06-04 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2013-06-04 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-05-30 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-04-17 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-04-02 | House | Referred to Transportation and Economic Development. |
2013-03-28 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Winters declared potential conflict of interest. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Monroe. Passed. Ayes, 26; nays, 2--Johnson, Whitsett; excused, 2--Girod, Starr. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |