OR SB738 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to public employee retirement.
Title
Relating to public employee retirement; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Ferrioli declared conflict of interest. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Motion to withdraw from Rules failed. Ayes, 13; nays, 16--Bates, Beyer, Burdick, Devlin, Dingfelder, Edwards, Hass, Johnson, Monnes Anderson, Monroe, Prozanski, Roblan, Rosenbaum, Shields, Steiner Hayward, President Courtney; excused, 1--George. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Rules, then Ways and Means. |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |