OR SB818 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires school district boards to adopt policy related to cardiac incidents.
Title
Relating to the safety of student athletes; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Laurie Monnes Anderson [D] | Sen. Alan Bates [D] | Sen. Arnie Roblan [D] | Sen. Sara Gelser Blouin [D] |
Rep. Alissa Keny-Guyer [D] | Rep. John Lively [D] | Rep. Jim Thompson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Education and Workforce Development. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |