PA HB1084 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 29-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-06 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-06 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 24 (Education) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in preliminary provisions relating to retirement for school employees, further providing for definitions.
Title
In preliminary provisions relating to retirement for school employees, further providing for definitions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-17 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1084 PN 2316, FP (Y: 145 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-10-06 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-06 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A03469 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-06 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A03469 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-06 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1084 PN 2316, FP (Y: 145 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-10-06 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-06 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A03469 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-06 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A03469 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-06 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-05-17 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |
2016-04-13 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-04-13 | House | Third consideration and final passage (145-49) |
2016-04-13 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-04-12 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-04-12 | House | Second consideration |
2016-04-11 | House | Removed from table |
2015-11-18 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-11-18 | House | Removed from table |
2015-10-06 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-10-06 | House | First consideration |
2015-10-06 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-04-28 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |