PA HB1347 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-14)
Status: Engrossed on November 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-13 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-13 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a portion of State Route 981 in Mount Pleasant Township, Westmoreland County, as the James Paul Takitch Honorary Highway.
Title
Designating a portion of State Route 981 in Mount Pleasant Township, Westmoreland County, as the James Paul Takitch Honorary Highway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-09 - House - House Floor: HB 1347 PN 2444, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-10-26 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-26 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A03603 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-26 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A03603 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-26 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-09 - House - House Floor: HB 1347 PN 2444, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-10-26 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-26 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A03603 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-26 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A03603 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-26 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-13 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2016-06-30 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-11-13 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2015-11-09 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-11-09 | House | Third consideration and final passage (197-0) |
2015-11-09 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-10-28 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-10-28 | House | Second consideration |
2015-10-27 | House | Removed from table |
2015-10-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-10-26 | House | First consideration |
2015-10-26 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-06-18 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |